Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 328 Today
» 1370 Yesterday
» 7398 Week
» 4506 Month
» 111452 Year
» 1333017 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LSWR 207 m/e 12/1891
SR (Pfx) E207 m/e 06/1924
SR (1931) 207 m/e 08/1931
BR 30207 m/e 08/1949

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LSWR Maunsell Green Black and White 06/1924
BR Black Red and White 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Adams
Class O2
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
Order Number D4
To Service During 12/1891
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/06/1957
Scrapping During 09/1957
Service Life 65 yrs, 6 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71D Fratton 6w/e 27/03/1953
   Withdrawn w/e 29/06/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PLY Plymouth Friary 9w/e 01/08/1948
ALLOC 71D Fratton 3w/e 27/03/1953
ALLOC 70C Guildford P 31/10/1956
ALLOC 70F Fratton 3w/e 17/11/1956
WDN   w/e 11/05/1957
WDN   w/e 29/06/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1891 To Service To service as LSWR Number 207
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
06/1924 Livery Change of livery to Maunsell Lined Green    
06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to E207    
08/1931 Renumbered Renumbered to 207    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
08/1949 Livery Change of livery to    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 30207    
27/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
06/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 30207    

prev prev