Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 287 Today
» 752 Yesterday
» 3526 Week
» 16039 Month
» 104231 Year
» 988612 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LSWR 223   10/1892
SR (Pfx) E223   03/1924
SR (1931) 223   05/1935
BR 30223   11/1950

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LSWR Maunsell Green Black and White 03/1924
BR Black Red and White 11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Adams
Class O2
Company History LSWR/SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Nine Elms Works
Order Number D4
To Service During 10/1892
Withdrawal During 10/1961
Scrapping During 12/1961
Service Life 69 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DOR Dorchester 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71B Bournemouth 6w/e 13/08/1952
71A Eastleigh 3w/e 17/11/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 71C Dorchester 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 30/07/1952
TOSTORE 71B Bournemouth 5w/e 16/09/1955
WDN   w/e 04/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1892 To Service To service as LSWR Number 223
Built at Nine Elms Works
   
03/1924 Livery Change of livery to Maunsell Lined Green    
03/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to E223    
05/1935 Renumbered Renumbered to 223    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dorchester (DOR)    
11/1950 Livery Change of livery to    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 30223    
13/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 30223    

prev prev