Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2627 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16033 Week
» 69049 Month
» 188576 Year
» 3215429 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and South Western Railway |
225 |
m/e |
11/1892 |
Southern Railway (Pfx) |
E225 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
Southern Railway (1931) |
225 |
m/e |
06/1932 |
British Railways |
30225 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Liveries Carried
Colour |
Lining |
Date From |
LSWR Maunsell Green |
Black and White |
01/1925 |
BR Black |
Red and White |
09/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Adams |
Class |
O2 |
Company History |
LSWR/SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Nine Elms Works |
Order Number |
D4 |
To Service |
During 11/1892 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 23/12/1962 |
Service Life |
70 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/01/1963 |
Eastleigh MPD (awaiting scrap) |
Eastleigh shed contained the following locomotives awaiting scrap: 4656, 30033/45/65/70, 30199/225/494/502/17, 30690, 30770, 30917/26/9/37, 30955, 31892, 32346/9/50/1, 32408. |
SLS/196303 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1892 |
To Service |
To service as London and South Western Railway Number 225 Built at Nine Elms Works |
|
|
01/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to E225 |
|
|
06/1932 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 225 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30225 |
|
|
13/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plymouth Friary (72D) |
|
|
02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
23/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30225 |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|