|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/10/1951 | Eastleigh Works | In shops, 30071, 30073, 30129 (being lined), 30183 (lined, ready to leave), 30236, 30248, 30316, 30327, 30368, 30466, 30487, 30520 (now plain black, was lined W/E 20/11/48), 30572, 30749, 30772, 30826, 30863, 30902, 32421 (general-being repainted), 32640 (slight attention), 34042/60/70/81/94/95, 34105, 35011 (dark green), 42099, an 73797 (from Longmoor). Being cut up, 30281, 32086. Awaiting same fate s282, 30417, 30432, (3)2056, -(3)2067. For shops: 30315, 30480, 30588, 34005/33/51, 34108, 35005/9. Recently ex shops: B.R. green, 30767/73 (W/E 13/10), 30797 an 34045 (20/10). 'L.N.W.' 30117 (second time, and looks fine). | SLS/195112 |
06/01/1960 | Eastleigh MPD | On shed: 30182(72C), 30236(72F), 30120 in steam; 32646/61 have acquired 71A shed plates but not 32677 which is in a poor state. | SLS/196002 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1895 | To Service | To service as London and South Western Railway Number 236 Built at Nine Elms Works |
||
02/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to E236 | ||
06/1935 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 236 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Plymouth Friary (PLY) | ||
10/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 30236 | ||
19/12/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wadebridge (72F) | ||
23/01/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 30236 | ||
02/1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |