Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4116 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17522 Week
» 70538 Month
» 190065 Year
» 3216918 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13045 |
26/03/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3045 |
25/09/1958 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
02/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/03/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/03/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13045 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
10/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
25/09/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3045 |
|
|
02/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
05/11/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3045 |
|
|
04/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|