Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 691 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14097 Week
» 67113 Month
» 186640 Year
» 3213493 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13048 |
23/04/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3048 |
02/11/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08035 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/04/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/04/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13048 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
02/11/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3048 |
|
|
05/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
09/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
03/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
30/09/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F) |
|
|
16/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
23/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08035 |
|
|
07/08/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (EJ) |
|
|
03/1978 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
30/09/1979 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08035 from Landore (LE) |
|
|
01/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|