Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 163 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17966 Week
» 70982 Month
» 190509 Year
» 3217362 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13049 |
23/04/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3049 |
30/11/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08036 |
06/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/04/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/04/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13049 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
08/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3049 |
|
|
01/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
20/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
15/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (6D) |
|
|
19/06/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08036 |
|
|
23/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (CH) |
|
|
08/11/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
07/09/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08036 from Willesden (WN) |
|
|
26/03/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|