Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1530 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19333 Week
» 72349 Month
» 191876 Year
» 3218729 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13052 |
19/06/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3052 |
10/05/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08039 |
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/06/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/06/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13052 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
14/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
13/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3052 |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 08039 but not taken up |
|
|
01/12/1973 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3052 |
|
|
08/1974 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|