Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 791 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5392 Week
» 16939 Month
» 416621 Year
» 493208 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13054 17/07/1954
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3054 18/01/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08041 05/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 17/07/1954
Withdrawn 08/08/1978 off Bescot (BS)
Time in Service 24 yrs , 22 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1979
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
5B Crewe South (New) 17/07/1954
2A Rugby m/e 14/08/1954
1E Bletchley w/e 27/07/1968
BS Bescot w/e 04/12/1976
   Withdrawn 08/08/1978


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/07/1954 To Service To service as 13054
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Crewe South (5B)
   
14/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
18/01/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to D3054    
27/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
05/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08041    
04/12/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (BS)    
08/08/1978 Withdrawn Condemned as 08041 from Bescot (BS)    
01/04/1979 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev