Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1514 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19317 Week
» 72333 Month
» 191860 Year
» 3218713 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13056 |
14/08/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3056 |
18/10/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08043 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/08/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/08/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13056 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
08/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
18/10/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3056 |
|
|
25/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) |
|
|
16/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) |
|
|
04/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08043 |
|
|
13/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (BU) |
|
|
18/12/1977 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08043 from Bury (BV) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|