Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 3549 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17592 Week
» 82546 Month
» 285210 Year
» 3312063 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13057 |
14/08/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3057 |
06/12/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08044 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/08/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/08/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13057 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
06/12/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3057 |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08044 |
|
|
15/06/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
31/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HI) |
|
|
20/09/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
04/01/1978 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08044 from Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
01/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|