Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 798 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5399 Week
» 16946 Month
» 416628 Year
» 493215 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13059 11/09/1954
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3059 30/05/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08046 07/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 11/09/1954
Withdrawn 18/05/1980 off Bury (BV)
Time in Service 25 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
15A Wellingborough (New) 11/09/1954
2F Woodford Halse w/e 03/12/1960
15A Wellingborough w/e 18/02/1961
2F Woodford Halse w/e 27/05/1961
15A Wellingborough w/e 17/06/1961
2F Woodford Halse w/e 17/03/1962
15A Wellingborough w/e 16/06/1962
15A Leicester Midland w/e 03/04/1965
15B Wellingborough w/e 16/04/1966
15A Leicester Midland w/e 04/11/1967
16C Derby w/e 11/11/1967
16A Toton w/e 29/03/1969
16F Burton w/e 28/02/1970
   Withdrawn 18/05/1980

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
14/08/1954 Sightings Derby Works Construction shops.: Around the works. - Under construction - complete. RO 9/1954 Link
11/09/1954 To Service To service as 13059
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Wellingborough (15A)
   
30/05/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to D3059    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
18/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
27/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
17/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A)    
03/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A)    
16/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B)    
04/11/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A)    
11/11/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (16C)    
29/03/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (16A)    
28/02/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (16F)    
07/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08046    
18/05/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 08046 from Bury (BV)    

prev prev