Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1464 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19267 Week
» 72283 Month
» 191810 Year
» 3218663 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13060 |
22/08/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3060 |
25/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08047 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/08/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/08/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13060 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Mexborough (36B) |
|
|
25/09/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3060 |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08047 |
|
|
28/10/1979 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08047 from Wath (WH) |
|
|
06/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|