Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 139 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 139 Week
» 17475 Month
» 295271 Year
» 1179652 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 2640 m/e 03/1878
BR 32640 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Marsh
Class Terriers
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 03/1878
Withdrawal w/e Sun 22/09/1963
Service Life 85 yrs, 6 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
FRA Fratton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75A Brighton 6w/e 20/03/1951
75A Brighton 4w/e 12/05/1951
71D Fratton 9w/e 30/06/1952
74E St Leonards 6w/e 13/08/1952
75A Brighton 8w/e 07/10/1952
71D Fratton 8w/e 13/05/1954
75A Brighton 4w/e 10/10/1955
70F Fratton 6w/e 15/06/1956
71A Eastleigh 5w/e 26/11/1959
75A Brighton 4w/e 27/05/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 22/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRA Fratton m/e 30/06/1947
TOSTORE FRA Fratton 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC AFD Ashford 9w/e 01/08/1948
ALLOC 75ANHN   6w/e 14/03/1951
TOSTORE 71A Eastleigh 5w/e 08/10/1951
TOSTORE 71D Fratton m/e 30/06/1952
REINS 74E St Leonards 2w/e 13/08/1952
ALLOC 75ANHN   10w/e 07/10/1952
ALLOC 71D Fratton 8w/e 13/05/1954
TOSTORE 70F Fratton 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 70F Fratton 4w/e 11/03/1955
ALLOC 75A Brighton 3w/e 10/10/1955
ALLOC 70F Fratton 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh P 26/11/1959
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 27/05/1963
WDN   w/e 22/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1878 To Service To service as SR Number 2640
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Fratton (FRA)    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 32640    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
13/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (74E)    
07/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
13/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
10/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (70F)    
26/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
27/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 32640    

prev prev