Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 125 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 2264 Week
» 12434 Month
» 290230 Year
» 1174611 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 32646   01/01/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Marsh
Class Terriers
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 01/1877
Withdrawal Mon 04/11/1963
Service Life 86 yrs, 10 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
FRA Fratton 4w/e 30/06/1949
75A Brighton (subshedded at Newhaven) 6w/e 05/09/1951
71D Fratton 5w/e 24/08/1953
75A Brighton 8w/e 13/05/1954
70F Fratton 6w/e 15/06/1956
71A Eastleigh 5w/e 26/11/1959
   Withdrawn 04/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRA Fratton 4w/e 30/06/1949
TOSTORE 71D Fratton m/e 31/08/1950
ALLOC 75ANHN   6w/e 05/09/1951
ALLOC 71D Fratton 5w/e 24/08/1953
ALLOC 75ANHN   8w/e 13/05/1954
ALLOC 75A Brighton 5w/e 16/09/1955
ALLOC 70F Fratton 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh P 26/11/1959
WDN   04/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/01/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 32646    
30/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (FRA)    
05/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A) (subshedded at Newhaven)    
24/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
13/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (70F)    
26/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
18/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
25/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 32646    

prev prev