Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3065 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16471 Week
» 69487 Month
» 189014 Year
» 3215867 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2655 |
m/e |
12/1875 |
British Railways |
32655 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
D. Marsh |
Class |
Terriers |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1875 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 28/05/1960 |
Service Life |
84 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys |
Information |
Purchased by the Bluebell Railway Society on withdrawal from BR and renumbered 55 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
74A |
Ashford |
9w/e |
26/05/1953 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
01/10/1953 |
REINS |
74A |
Ashford |
10w/e |
10/12/1953 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
6w/e |
30/12/1953 |
ALLOC |
74E |
St Leonards |
6w/e |
08/02/1954 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
7w/e |
01/11/1955 |
TOSTORE |
75A |
Brighton |
7w/e |
19/12/1955 |
REINS |
75A |
Brighton |
6w/e |
29/01/1956 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
4w/e |
27/02/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
28/05/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
Status Date |
17/09/2018 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/11/1945 |
Brighton Works |
21C116, fully painted, was in traffic during the last week in November, and 21C117 was running trials in shop grey, with green tender. W.D. 72401 is repainted black with yellow lettering on the tank sides. No. 2655 has had the condenser pipes removed and injectors fitted after a very heavy overhaul, which was practically a rebuild. No. 2662 is now in shops for similar treatment. The E2 No. 2101 is also under repair, and on arrival still had the large numerals on the tanks. It is understood that all the engines in the Isle of Wight will be repainted green as they go through shops. The Brighton Works Yard Shunter, 380S, had a Drummond type chimney fitted in November, and during the few days it was in shops No, 2662 took over the yard duties. The D1 tank, No. 2283, has been the Brighton Station shunter during the latter half of November in place of No. 2597. |
SLS/194602 |
31/10/1949 |
Brighton Section |
No. 32678 (derailed on the K. & E.S.R. earlier in the year) has returned to traffic, painted black and fully lined. No. 2655 was working the Hayling Island branch during September and No. 2659 was on hop-picking specials from St. Leonards and Robertsbridge to Bodiam. 'D.3' No. 32393 is ex Works after heavy repairs and is painted black and fully lined. 'Atlantic' No. 2038 is in store at Eastbourne. |
SLS/194911 |
22/11/1949 |
Brighton Works |
On 22/11 'Leader' Class No. 36001 was still running trial trips with empty coaches, but had not yet been handed over to the Running Dept. No. 36002 was stored in the Electric Car Sheds at Brighton. Locomotives in shops on 16/11 were: Nos. 2386, 32498, 2528, 32538, 2594, 2655, 77340, 90247, 90354, 90375 (78569). 90622/69 and Diesel No. 3. Some of the W.D. locomotives carry the new numbers on the cab side, but the old number on, the buffer beam has not yet been painted out. New 'W.C.' No. 34096 Trevone left the Works fully painted on 15/11 . |
SLS/194912 |
03/03/1953 |
Brighton Works |
No. 80059, the first of ten new 2-6-4 tanks left the works on 3rd March; a further ten are also to be built in this 'year's programme. Engines under and awaiting repair include 30027, 30109, 30825/37, 30338, 30951/7, 32655. 30117 an 30919 have been through shops but have not been repainted. While DS515 was receiving attention here its place at Lancing was taken by 32636; 80060 was due on 2/3 but was not ready. An unusual visitor to the shed on 3rd March was 32113. |
SLS/195304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1875 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2655 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Fratton (FRA) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32655 |
|
|
26/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
08/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
01/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
10/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
28/05/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32655 |
|
|