12/08/1950 |
S.R. Renumbering |
The official notices refer to locomotives by their new numbers whether actually re-numbered or not: sometimes a re-numbering is advised twice at widely distant dates: hence though the following list of un-renumbered engines is believed to be correct, observations (prior to 12/8/50) may prove it otherwise, and members' notes would be appreciated: 7, 20 (T.1); 24, 26, 34, 37, 42, 44, 49, 50, 54, 58 (M.7); 61, 63, 64, 68-71, 73 (USA); 82, 84, 87, 88, 93, 96, 102 (B.4); 111 (M.7); 113/4/6/8 (T.9); 127 (M.7); 148, 154/5/7/8 (L.11); 162 (G.6); 165, 170/2/4 (L.11); 192, 200/3/4, 212, 223/4/9 (0.2); 238 (G.6); 246, 250/1/3/5/6 (M.7); 259, 268 (G.6); 280/2/5, 303/4/5 (T.9); 308 (700); 311/4 (T.9); 324 (M.7); 325 (700); 336/8 (T.9); 353 (G.6); 355 (700); 356 (M.7); 367 (T.1); 384/9, 390 (K.10); 395, 401/2 (S.11); 408, 411-414 (L.11); 422, 430/3 (L.12); 436/7, 441 (L.11); 463 (D.15); 481 (M.7); 482 (H.15); 494 (G.16); 498 (S.15); 518 (H.16); 532 (Q.); 3029, 3433/6, 3441 (0395); 3741 (C.14); 667, 670 (M.7); 691/3/7/8/9 (700); 713, 722/3/8, 731 (T.9); 746 (N.15); 756 (756); 758 (757); 769, 770 (N.15); 863 (LN); 1041/4, 1064/6 (0.1); 1071/86 (C); 1093 (0.1); 1102 (C); 1107 (R.1); 1108 (0.1); 1112 (C); 1147 (R.1); 1150 (C); 1157 (E); 1191 (C); 1217 (B.1); 1222/2/44/5 (C); 1248 (0.1); 1252/71 (C); 1274/6 (H); 1291 (C); 1321 (H); 1335/7/9 (R.1); 1373/9/81/90/1/5 (0.1); 1432 (0.1); 1443 (B.1); 1480 (C); 1491 (E); 1493 (D); 1508/13 (C); 1519/42/3/4 (H); 1547 (E); 1552 (H); 1558 (P); 1572 (C); 1574/7 (D); 1590 (C); 1602 (T); 1611/23 (U); 1666/73 (R); 1683 (C); 1685 (S); 1693 (C); 1708 (R.1); 1711/2/4/8/21/4 (C); 1730/2 (D); 1735/9 (D.1); 1748 (D); 1754/5/8 (L.1); 1770/8 (L); 1792, 1809 (U); 1825/41/52 (N); 2002/8/9 (I.1x); 2045/50/2 (3.4x); 2054 (B.4); 2055/6/60 (B.4x); 2062/3 (B.4); 2067 (I3.4x); 2068 (B.4); 2070/3 (B.4x); 2075/91 (I.3); 2101/4/9 (E.2); 2133/8/56 (E.1); 2168 (E.3); 2306 (C.3); 2328 (N.15x); 2342 (K); 2359 (D.1); 2385/91 (D.3); 2407 (E.6x); 2408/18 (E.6); 2425 (H.2); 2447 (C.2x); 2472/3/5/85/7, 2517 (E.4); 2522 (C.2x); 2556/60 (E.4); 2573/92 (E.5); 2595/6, 2602/3 (I.1x); 2608 (E.1r); 2647/61 (A.1x); 2691/4 (E.1); 2695/7 (E.1r); C1, C3, C11, C21 (Q.1); 21C7 (MN); Diesel 1; 77090/101/50/226/96/355, 78597 (WD). Several have since been renumbered. |
SLS/195012 |
28/04/1951 |
Eastleigh Works |
Noted 28.4.51-30066, 82, 30331, 30477/90/99, 30589 (being lined out), 30689, 30781/91/93, 30843, 30920/33/50, 2138, 32351, 32661 (lined out), 3441, 34007/25/49/55/79/99, 34103, 35003/10. Nos. 32328 an 32608 ex shops, lined, also 32094 (ex W/E 21/4/51). Waiting shops: 30305/14, 30829, 34002/6/30, 30197. Being cut up: 30446, 36001(!). Waiting cutting-up: 116, 30156/73, 441. Increased coal capacity: 32510/79 fitted at Eastleigh shed with coal rails for use on Fawley branch. An Adams Al2, withdrawn in 1946 is acting as stationary boiler and is re-numbered DS3191. The frames and cylinders of 722 are in good condition and are being retained as spares for the class. |
SLS/195106 |
25/02/1954 |
Brighton Works |
New construction includes Main Line Diesel-Electric 10203 (approaching completion), 80079 (due 12/2), 80080 (due 2/3), 80081 (due 17/3), 80082 (due 1/4). Terrier 32661 has been re-painted, also- 30922, 30545. Other repairs include 30929, 30785, 32133, 32506, 30732, 30285, 15202, 15231, 10000 (nearly ready to leave), 32670, 42104, 30053, 30044. Nos. 76005/6 have been performing indifferently from Brighton on the heavy 8.20 a.m. up and 3.52 p.m. down via Eridge. It had been hoped that these engines might be the answer to the problem of the through Uckfield to London services, but their performances so far has been in no way superior to that of the Class 4 tanks. |
SLS/195404 |
06/01/1960 |
Eastleigh MPD |
On shed: 30182(72C), 30236(72F), 30120 in steam; 32646/61 have acquired 71A shed plates but not 32677 which is in a poor state. |
SLS/196002 |
12/05/1963 |
Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. |
SLS/196304 |
07/09/1963 |
Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 30073, 30824, 33037, 34006/15/21/33/41/51, 34043 partially cut up, 35014/7/8/25/7, 41316/24, 73049/51, 75069, 76010/28/68, 80015/31/42/82, D3668, D4100, D6536/45, E5007, E6001. Test House: 31834. Scrap Yard: 30510, 30911. Works Yard: 35010, WD601 ex works, 31400, 31846, 34036 damaged front end, 34055 (with smoke-box door from 34043), 35029, 73110 (all waiting works), 30915, 31818, 32338, 32635/61 waiting scrap. |
SLS/196310 |