Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 905 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6510 Week
» 18057 Month
» 417739 Year
» 494326 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 2662   10/1875
BR 32662   10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Marsh
Class Terriers
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 10/1875
Withdrawal During 11/1963
Service Life 88 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
FRA Fratton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74E St Leonards 4w/e 01/10/1953
75A Brighton 4w/e 30/12/1953
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 27/05/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
REINS 71D Fratton 6w/e 05/09/1951
TOSTORE 71D Fratton 7w/e 21/01/1952
TOSTORE 74E St Leonards 5w/e 01/10/1953
TOSTORE 75ANHN   10w/e 10/12/1953
REINS 75ANHN   5w/e 12/08/1955
ALLOC 75A Brighton 5w/e 16/09/1955
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 27/05/1963
WDN   04/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1875 To Service To service as SR Number 2662
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Fratton (FRA)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 32662    
01/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (74E)    
30/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
27/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 32662    

prev prev