Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 709 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 4530 Week
» 21866 Month
» 299662 Year
» 1184043 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) KESR3 m/e 12/1872
BR 32670 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer D. Marsh
Class Terriers
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 12/1872
Withdrawal Mon 04/11/1963
Service Life 90 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KESR Kent and East Sussex Railway 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74E St Leonards 4w/e 20/08/1954
75A Brighton 4w/e 14/01/1958
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 27/05/1963
   Withdrawn 04/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE   4w/e 13/04/1951
ALLOC 74E St Leonards P 20/08/1954
TOSTORE 74E St Leonards 8w/e 08/02/1955
REINS 74E St Leonards w/e 13/06/1955
TOSTORE 74E St Leonards 5w/e 16/09/1955
ALLOC 75A Brighton q/e 14/01/1958
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 4w/e 27/05/1963
WDN   04/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1872 To Service To service as SR Number KESR3
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kent and East Sussex Railway (KESR)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 32670    
20/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (74E)    
14/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
27/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 32670    

prev