Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
539 |
m/e |
12/1938 |
British Railways |
30539 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Q |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 12/1938 to Bournemouth (BM) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 13/01/1963 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 1 mth , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/05/1963 |
Eastligh MPD (Waiting Works) |
Waiting Works: DS682, 30031/65/70/89, 30105/10/99, 30328, 30513/39, 30936, 31612, 31861/6, 31906/8/9, 32503, 33009, 34046/84, 35012, 76013/4. Ex Works: D6527, 31803/53, 35004, 82023. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1938 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 539 Built at Eastleigh Works Allocated to Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Redhill (RED) |
|
|
01/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (NORW) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30539 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
16/09/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B) |
|
|
13/01/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30539 |
|
|
06/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|