Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 680 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19591 Week
» 84545 Month
» 287209 Year
» 3314062 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
540 |
on |
04/01/1939 |
British Railways |
30540 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Q |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
Sat 04/01/1939 to Bournemouth (BM) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/11/1962 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/01/1960 |
Eastleigh Works (Erecting shop) |
Erecting shop: 30056/108/516/33/40/86/668/73/7/87/9/950, 34006/63/86/106/10, 35004, 41291, 73110/15, 75079, 78005/56, 80013, E5001. Ex-works: 32106, 34099, 84029, E20003. Waiting works: 30035/475, 34067, 80089; on 'dump', 30179/318/774. |
SLS/196002 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/01/1939 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 540 Built at Eastleigh Works Allocated to Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Horsham (HOR) |
|
|
01/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (3B ) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30540 |
|
|
20/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
08/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30540 |
|
|
05/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|