03/06/1953 |
Midhurst |
The generally two-coach motor trains on the Petersfield-Midhurst branch are worked by Drummond 0-4-4 tanks, notably 30048/9 an 30109. To work the daily freight from Midhurst to Petersfield, a Class 'Q' 0-6-0 (usually 30545) runs light engine from Pulborough to Petersfield in front of the passenger from there, which is due in Midhurst just before 11 a.m. On the Chichester-Midhurst branch there is a freight as far as Cocking every other day. The track up to the gap in the embankment near Midhurst is still in situ on both sides and is kept weeded on the Cocking side to within a few hundred yards of the 'wash-out.' |
SLS/195311 |
25/02/1954 |
Brighton Works |
New construction includes Main Line Diesel-Electric 10203 (approaching completion), 80079 (due 12/2), 80080 (due 2/3), 80081 (due 17/3), 80082 (due 1/4). Terrier 32661 has been re-painted, also- 30922, 30545. Other repairs include 30929, 30785, 32133, 32506, 30732, 30285, 15202, 15231, 10000 (nearly ready to leave), 32670, 42104, 30053, 30044. Nos. 76005/6 have been performing indifferently from Brighton on the heavy 8.20 a.m. up and 3.52 p.m. down via Eridge. It had been hoped that these engines might be the answer to the problem of the through Uckfield to London services, but their performances so far has been in no way superior to that of the Class 4 tanks. |
SLS/195404 |
18/07/1959 |
Horsham MPD (Three Bridges) |
Horsham closed from 18th July and duties and engines shared between Brighton (30047/8/9/50/1) and Three Bridges (30544/5/6/7, 32463/9/70, 32522/6/41). Shunting is performed by a Guildford 350 H.P. Diesel. |
SLS/195909 |
25/02/1962 |
Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) |
Works Yard: D2250, D3042, D3271, D6500/3, 33020, 41324, 76025/9. Erecting Shop: D3471, D5012/4, D6506/7/14/63, E6002, L.S.W.R. 120, 15212, 30045, 30515/42/5, 30781, 30838/43, 30955, 31413, 31795/8, 32636/46, 33039, 34002/11/8/24/66, 35025, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76016/63, 80010, 80141/51, 92239. Behind Erecting Shop: 30059, 30475/6, 30692, 30864, 80064. |
SLS/196204 |
12/05/1963 |
Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. |
SLS/196304 |