Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1927 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19730 Week
» 72746 Month
» 192273 Year
» 3219126 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
549 |
m/e |
09/1939 |
British Railways |
30549 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Q |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 09/1939 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 21/07/1963 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/01/1953 |
Brighton Works |
In shops 15/1/53: 15219, 30038 (came in green but being lined black), 30048, 30106/8, 30544/9, 30913 Christ's Hospital, 30919 Harrow, 32167/9, 32441/9, 32532. Under construction, 80059 (due 13/2), 80060 (due 2/3). No. 32570 left same day, freshly painted and lined, and 10201 was outside, possibly after trial trip. |
SLS/195303 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1939 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 549 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (NORW) |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (BM) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 30549 |
|
|
16/09/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
04/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
02/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (75D) |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
21/07/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 30549 |
|
|
04/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|