Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 94 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3711 Week
» 15416 Month
» 346905 Year
» 423492 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13067 21/11/1953
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3067 22/11/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08054 04/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 21/11/1953
Withdrawn 16/02/1980 off Gateshead (GD)
Time in Service 26 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
38E Woodford Halse (New) 21/11/1953
1A Willesden w/e 19/06/1965
BY Bletchley w/e 16/06/1973
WN Willesden w/e 04/08/1973
SF Stratford w/e 29/12/1973
GD Gateshead w/e 06/09/1975
   Withdrawn 16/02/1980

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
21/11/1953 To Service To service as 13067
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Woodford Halse (38E)
   
22/11/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to D3067    
06/04/1962 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. SLS 5/1962 Link
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
16/06/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (BY)    
04/08/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (WN)    
29/12/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08054    
06/09/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GD)    
16/02/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 08054 from Gateshead (GD)    

prev prev