Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 4133 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17539 Week
» 70555 Month
» 190082 Year
» 3216935 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13069 |
21/11/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3069 |
17/05/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/11/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/11/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13069 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Woodford Halse (38E) |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3069 |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
10/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Watford (1C) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
04/03/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
07/01/1973 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3069 from Stratford (30A) |
|
|
03/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by British Rail: at Thornaby MPD |
|
|