Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4161 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17567 Week
» 70583 Month
» 190110 Year
» 3216963 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D307 |
27/10/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40107 |
19/10/1973 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
27/10/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/10/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/10/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D307 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
11/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
07/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
19/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40107 |
|
|
20/12/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40107 |
|
|
09/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|