Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1747 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19550 Week
» 72566 Month
» 192093 Year
» 3218946 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
E3071 |
27/10/1962 |
TOPS (Tops) |
85016 |
03/1975 |
TOPS (85/1) |
85105 |
06/07/1989 |
|
Configuration
Configuration Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Source |
27/10/1962 |
ve |
Vacuum braked, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/10/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number E3071 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
03/1975 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 85016 |
|
|
06/07/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 85105 |
|
|
01/07/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 85105 |
|
|
01/09/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|