Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3816 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17222 Week
» 70238 Month
» 189765 Year
» 3216618 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13073 |
19/12/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3073 |
13/07/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08059 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/12/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/12/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13073 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
13/07/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3073 |
|
|
08/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
15/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
14/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
10/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08059 |
|
|
03/1977 |
To Store |
To Store (Darlington) |
|
|
09/1977 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
21/09/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08059 from Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
06/04/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|