Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 975 Today
» 5975 Yesterday
» 6950 Week
» 105595 Month
» 308259 Year
» 3335112 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13077 |
23/01/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3077 |
22/03/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08063 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/01/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/01/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13077 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
22/03/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3077 |
|
|
26/09/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08063 |
|
|
07/12/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (DN) |
|
|
08/07/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08063 from Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
06/04/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|