Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 107 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17910 Week
» 70926 Month
» 190453 Year
» 3217306 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D308 |
07/11/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40108 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
07/11/1960 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
24/08/1980 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys |
Cut Up |
12/1980 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
07/11/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/11/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/11/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D308 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
11/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
07/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40108 |
|
|
24/08/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40108 |
|
|
12/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|