Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 2446 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15852 Week
» 68868 Month
» 188395 Year
» 3215248 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13086 |
06/11/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3086 |
05/01/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08071 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1975 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/11/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
by 03/1975 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/11/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13086 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
01/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
29/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
05/01/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3086 |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
18/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08071 |
|
|
03/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
20/09/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HI) |
|
|
13/12/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (DN) |
|
|
14/02/1978 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08071 from Darlington (DN) |
|
|
07/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|