Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 785 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18588 Week
» 71604 Month
» 191131 Year
» 3217984 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13088 |
06/11/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3088 |
05/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08073 |
|
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 05/1970 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1972 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/11/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
by 05/1970 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
12/1972 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/11/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13088 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (21C) |
|
|
05/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3088 |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (2G) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
12/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 08073 but not taken up |
|
|
01/12/1973 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3088 |
|
|
10/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by National Coal Board: Bates Colliery |
|
|