Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2623 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16029 Week
» 69045 Month
» 188572 Year
» 3215425 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13091 |
04/12/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3091 |
10/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08076 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/12/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/12/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13091 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) |
|
|
10/10/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3091 |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
20/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
21/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08076 |
|
|
03/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
09/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
21/09/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08076 from Immingham (IM) |
|
|
04/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|