Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 189 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 189 Week
» 18971 Month
» 267264 Year
» 1151645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13102 11/02/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3102 31/03/1959
TOPS (Tops) 08077 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 11/02/1955
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
86E Severn Tunnel Junction (New) 11/02/1955
86B Ebbw Junction (Newport) 7w/e 27/07/1968
82C Swindon 5w/e 27/09/1969
2E Saltley w/e 06/12/1969
8J Allerton w/e 24/01/1970
8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 07/03/1970
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 08/01/1972
DR Doncaster w/e 11/01/1976
CA Cambridge 2w/e 25/01/1976
   Stored 2w/e 08/08/1976


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
11/02/1955 To Service To service as 13102
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E)
   
03/1959 Renumbered Renumbered to D3102    
27/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B)    
27/09/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
06/12/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (2E)    
24/01/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Allerton (8J)    
07/03/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08077    
11/01/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DR)    
25/01/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CA)    
08/08/1976 Allocation      
08/08/1976 To Store To Store    

prev prev