Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1402 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19205 Week
» 72221 Month
» 191748 Year
» 3218601 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13103 |
16/02/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3103 |
11/12/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08078 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/02/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/02/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13103 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) |
|
|
11/12/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3103 |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
14/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08078 |
|
|
04/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (CH) |
|
|
09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
14/08/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08078 from Carlisle Kingmoor (KD) |
|
|
30/11/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|