Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 941 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14347 Week
» 67363 Month
» 186890 Year
» 3213743 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13107 |
11/03/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3107 |
04/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08082 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/03/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/03/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13107 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Banbury (84C) |
|
|
04/09/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3107 |
|
|
01/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (2J) |
|
|
16/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
20/11/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
22/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08082 |
|
|
02/11/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08082 from Bletchley (BY) |
|
|
02/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|