Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 115 Today
» 868 Yesterday
» 115 Week
» 19010 Month
» 241411 Year
» 1125792 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3112 m/e 01/1905
GWR (51xx) 5112 m/e 06/1928

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 3100/5100
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
310001/1905
510006/1928
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 01/1905
Withdrawal During 10/1955
Service Life 50 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GLO Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 31/12/1949
84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 27/12/1952
84E Tyseley 4w/e 21/02/1953
84A Stafford Road 4w/e 08/08/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1911 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev