Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1208 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19011 Week
» 72027 Month
» 191554 Year
» 3218407 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13113 |
13/04/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3113 |
16/03/1962 |
At Swindon Factory |
TOPS (Tops) |
08088 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/04/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/04/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13113 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
21/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
16/03/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3113 |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08088 |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
25/09/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08088 from Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
30/11/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|