Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 530 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2437 Week
» 21219 Month
» 269512 Year
» 1153893 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13114 19/04/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3114 31/08/1960
TOPS (Tops) 08089 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 19/04/1955
Withdrawn 21/09/1980 off Cambridge (CA)
Time in Service 25 yrs, 5 mths , 2 dys
Cut Up 01/12/1980
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
84G Shrewsbury (New) 19/04/1955
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 05/11/1960
82C Swindon 9w/e 18/03/1968
85B Gloucester Horton Road 10w/e 01/06/1968
BR Bristol Bath Road w/e 16/03/1974
91E To Eastern Region w/e 10/01/1976
SF Stratford w/e 11/01/1976
CA Cambridge 2w/e 25/01/1976
   Withdrawn 21/09/1980


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/04/1955 To Service To service as 13114
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Shrewsbury (84G)
   
08/1960 Renumbered Renumbered to D3114    
05/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
18/03/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
01/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08089    
16/03/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR)    
10/01/1976 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
11/01/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
25/01/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CA)    
21/09/1980 Withdrawn Condemned as 08089 from Cambridge (CA)    
01/12/1980 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev