Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 178 Today
» 977 Yesterday
» 4174 Week
» 11358 Month
» 319339 Year
» 1203720 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13115 25/04/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3115 17/11/1961
TOPS (Tops) 08090 03/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 25/04/1955
Withdrawn 27/11/1977 off Cambridge (CA)
Time in Service 22 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys
Cut Up 01/11/1978
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
84G Shrewsbury (New) 25/04/1955
84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 16/07/1955
2F Bescot w/e 03/10/1964
2G Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 16/04/1966
2F Bescot w/e 22/04/1967
DR Doncaster w/e 11/01/1976
CA Cambridge 2w/e 25/01/1976
   Withdrawn 27/11/1977


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/04/1955 To Service To service as 13115
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Shrewsbury (84G)
   
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F)    
11/1961 Renumbered Renumbered to D3115    
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
03/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
16/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (2G)    
22/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08090    
11/01/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DR)    
25/01/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CA)    
27/11/1977 Withdrawn Condemned as 08090 from Cambridge (CA)    
01/11/1978 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev