Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4247 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17653 Week
» 70669 Month
» 190196 Year
» 3217049 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13116 |
29/04/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3116 |
08/09/1960 |
At Swindon Works |
TOPS (Tops) |
08091 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 05/1970 |
|
Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1972 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/04/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
by 05/1970 |
vr |
Vacuum brakes, Radio Telephone fitted |
|
|
|
12/1972 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/04/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13116 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
13/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
08/09/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3116 |
|
|
03/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (2G) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone fitted |
|
|
12/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08091 |
|
|
15/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
13/12/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Blazey (BZ) |
|
|
14/11/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08091 from Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
21/01/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|