Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 87 Today
» 865 Yesterday
» 952 Week
» 13985 Month
» 236386 Year
» 1120767 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3118 m/e 02/1905
GWR (51xx) 5118 m/e 05/1928
GWR (81xx) 8102 m/e 06/1938

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 3100/5100
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
310002/1905
510005/1928
810006/1938
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 02/1905
Withdrawal During 05/1964
Service Life 59 yrs, 2 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
217 Whitland 4w/e 01/12/1945
87G Carmarthen 4w/e 05/10/1957
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 31/12/1960
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 06/04/1963
83C Westbury 4w/e 02/11/1963
85A Worcester 4w/e 25/01/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1911 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev