|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/04/1964 | Swindon Works (Works Yard) | Works Yard: D3508, D3811, 1024, 1447, 1666, 2818, 3721, 4652, 4923, 6106, 6147, 6871, 6915, 6952, 7812, 8102, 8732, 8738, 9425, 9431, 9484, 9486, 9743, 9752, 42961, 42978, 42983, 43001, 43115, 43132, 73003, 73021. A Shop: D812, D831, D846, D1004, D1005, D1013, D1027, D1035, D1041, D848, D1043, D1058, D1065, D1067, D3421, D3808, D3816, D3823, D3828, D3831, D7026, D7029, D7064, D7071, D7080, D9500, D9501, D9502, D9503, D9504, D9505, D9506, D9057 motors mounted, D9508, D9509, D9510, D9511 frames only, 4144, 7019, 7915, 8486, 42954, 42958, 43002, 43044, 43056, 43075, 43090, 43109, 73053, 73066, 76077, 76081, 92225. C Shop: 6025. Dump: 1650, 4706, 5057, 6010, 6603, 6680, 6824, 9420, 9603, 47623. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1905 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 3118 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2073 |
||
05/1911 | Modification | Modification: Superheated boiler fitted | ||
05/1928 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5118 | ||
15/06/1938 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8102 | ||
01/12/1945 | Allocation | |||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Whitland (WTD) | ||
05/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) | ||
31/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
06/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) | ||
02/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westbury (83C) | ||
25/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (85A) | ||
14/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 8102 |