Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4379 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17785 Week
» 70801 Month
» 190328 Year
» 3217181 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D312 |
13/12/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40112 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
13/12/1960 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
28/12/1980 |
Time in Service |
20 yrs , 15 dys |
Cut Up |
10/1985 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Information |
Coolant leak,stopped at 0800hrs on 05/12/80 |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
13/12/1960 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/12/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
20/11/1964 |
Severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D312 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
31/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
20/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40112 |
|
|
28/12/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40112 |
|
|
10/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|