Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 4306 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 19918 Week
» 118563 Month
» 321227 Year
» 3348080 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13120 |
08/07/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3120 |
30/06/1962 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
D3/3 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
08/07/1955 to Toton (18A) |
Withdrawn |
08/07/1967 |
Time in Service |
12 yrs |
Cut Up |
m/e 05/1968 |
Cut At |
Cohens (Kettering) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/07/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13120 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
19/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (13A) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
29/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
30/06/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3120 |
|
|
08/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3120 |
|
|
05/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|