Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 427 Today
» 823 Yesterday
» 5621 Week
» 12672 Month
» 235073 Year
» 1119454 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3124 m/e 05/1905
GWR (51xx) 5124 m/e 03/1929
GWR (81xx) 8104 m/e 01/1939

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class 3100/5100
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
310005/1905
510003/1929
810001/1939
Wheels 2-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 05/1905
Withdrawal During 12/1964
Service Life 59 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
83F Truro m/e 16/06/1956
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 14/07/1956
85A Worcester 4w/e 06/10/1962
85A Worcester 4w/e 02/11/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1911 Superheated boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also

prev prev