Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 5109 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20721 Week
» 119366 Month
» 322030 Year
» 3348883 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13127 |
24/07/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3127 |
01/09/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08092 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 03/1975 |
|
Radio telephone removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/07/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
by 03/1975 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/07/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13127 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
31/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
14/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
19/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
01/09/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3127 |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
18/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08092 |
|
|
03/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Radio telephone removed |
|
|
30/11/1978 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08092 from March (MR) |
|
|
02/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|