Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 628 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18431 Week
» 71447 Month
» 190974 Year
» 3217827 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13128 |
31/08/1954 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3128 |
07/09/1957 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08093 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/08/1954 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/08/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13128 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
07/09/1957 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3128 |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
22/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
01/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
29/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08093 |
|
|
16/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (BG) |
|
|
23/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (FH) |
|
|
26/07/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08093 from York (North) (YK) |
|
|
03/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|