Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 140 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 140 Week
» 21981 Month
» 217435 Year
» 1101816 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13137 02/03/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3137 17/05/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 02/03/1955
Withdrawn 02/07/1970
Time in Service 15 yrs , 4 mths
Cut Up 01/11/1970
Cut At C F Booth (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
53C Hull Springhead (New) 02/03/1955
51A Darlington 5w/e 24/03/1956
51L Thornaby w/e 06/02/1960
51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 26/03/1966
51L Thornaby 4w/e 07/10/1967
34E New England w/e 29/06/1968
91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 20/07/1968
31B March w/e 26/10/1968
   Withdrawn 02/07/1970

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
02/03/1955 Power Unit IH63723    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
02/03/1955 To Service To service as 13137
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Hull Springhead (53C)
   
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
05/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to D3137    
06/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
26/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
07/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
29/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
20/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
26/10/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
02/07/1970 Withdrawn Condemned as D3137    
01/11/1970 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Doncaster    

prev