Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 737 Today
» 820 Yesterday
» 4140 Week
» 21089 Month
» 135350 Year
» 1019731 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 13138 05/03/1955
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3138 01/11/1958

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 10
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 05/03/1955
Withdrawn 23/04/1972
Time in Service 17 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys
Cut Up 01/08/1973
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
53C Hull Springhead (New) 05/03/1955
51A Darlington 5w/e 24/03/1956
51L Thornaby 5w/e 15/11/1958
34E New England w/e 29/06/1968
91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 20/07/1968
31B March w/e 26/10/1968
   Withdrawn 23/04/1972

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
05/03/1955 Power Unit IH63870    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/03/1955 To Service To service as 13138
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Hull Springhead (53C)
   
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
10/1958 Renumbered Renumbered to D3138    
15/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
25/03/1962 Sightings Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop. SLS 5/1962 Link
29/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
20/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E)    
26/10/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
23/04/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as D3138    
01/08/1973 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev